Heritage Bank Southridge

Wisconsin – Milwaukee – Greendale

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20869

1972

FDIC Certificate Number: 20869
FDIC's unique number: 14418
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Milwaukee

Federal Reserve ID Number: 674746
Report Date: 1982-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1972-11-18 Institution established. Original name: The Southridge Bank Of Greendale.
1972-11-18 Acquired Southridge National Bank Of Greendale in Greendale, Wisconsin.
1981-04-27 Changed name to Heritage Bank Southridge .
1982-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Heritage Bank in Wauwatosa, Wisconsin.
1985-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of M&I; Marshall and Ilsley Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1987-03-01 Acquired M&i; Silver Spring Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1987-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Greenfield in Greenfield, Wisconsin.
1987-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bay View State Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1994-08-01 Acquired Valley Bank in Wauwatosa, Wisconsin.
1994-08-01 Acquired M&i; Wauwatosa State Bank in Wauwatosa, Wisconsin.
1994-08-01 Acquired M&i; Greater Milwaukee Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1995-10-01 Acquired M&i; South Shore Bank in Cudahy, Wisconsin.
1997-10-01 Acquired Security Bank, S.S.B. in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2000-11-01 Acquired M & I Lakeview Bank in Sheboygan, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Burlington in Burlington, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; First National Bank in West Bend, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Racine in Racine, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Northern Bank in Brookfield, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Menomonee Falls in Menomonee Falls, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Lake Country Bank in Hartland, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Central State Bank in Oshkosh, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Shawano in Shawano, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Fox Valley in Appleton, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Northeast in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Mid-state Bank in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bank in Superior, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Ashland in Ashland, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; First American Bank in Wausau, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Citizens American Bank in Merrill, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Merchants Bank in Rhinelander, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Central Bank & Trust in Marshfield, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Eagle River in Eagle River, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank South in Janesville, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank South Central in Watertown, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Mayville in Mayville, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of La Crosse in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Community State Bank in Eau Claire, Wisconsin.
2001-06-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Southern Wisconsin in Madison, Wisconsin.
2001-06-01 Acquired M&i; Thunderbird Bank in Phoenix, Arizona.
2001-11-01 Acquired National City Bank Of Minneapolis in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2002-06-01 Acquired Richfield Bank & Trust Co. in Richfield, Minnesota.
2002-06-01 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Eden Prairie, Minnesota.
2003-02-01 Acquired Southwest Bank Of Phoenix in Phoenix, Arizona.
2006-04-03 Acquired Gold Bank in Leawood, Kansas.
2007-06-27 Acquired United Heritage Bank in Orlando, Florida.
2007-08-01 Acquired Excel Bank Minnesota in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2008-02-02 Acquired First Indiana Bank, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2010-07-01 Acquired Southwest Bank, An M&i; Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2011-07-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BMO Harris Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.

Total assets: $26,173,000
Total deposits: $21,513,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Heritage Bank Southridge does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Heritage Bank Southridge, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Heritage Bank Southridge will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-362

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.