Heritage Federal Bank

South Carolina – Laurens – Laurens

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30338

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 30338
FDIC's unique number: 43172
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Sc

Federal Reserve ID Number: 124979
Report Date: 2001-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2001-07-18

1948-04-19 Institution established. Original name: Heritage Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1998-04-06 Changed name to Heritage Federal Bank .
1998-04-06 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2001-06-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SouthBank in Anderson, South Carolina.
2001-11-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Central Carolina Bank and Trust Company in Durham, North Carolina.
2001-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National Bank of Commerce in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SunTrust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Gainesville Bank & Trust in Gainesville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Hiram, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of The South in Milledgeville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired United Bank & Trust Company in Rockmart, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Home Town Bank Of Villa Rica in Villa Rica, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Gwinnett in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Mountain State Bank in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2008-08-01 Acquired First Priority Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $290,241,000
Total deposits: $217,253,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Heritage Federal Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Heritage Federal Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Heritage Federal Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-248

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.