Heritage Savings Bank

New York – Ulster – Kingston

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

16003

1874

FDIC Certificate Number: 16003
FDIC's unique number: 10233
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 317605
Report Date: 1979-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1997-10-08

1874-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Heritage Savings Bank.
1975-01-02 Acquired Beacon Savings Bank in Beacon, New York.
1979-04-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Albany Savings Bank in Albany, New York.
1982-01-01 Acquired Newburgh Savings Bank in Newburgh, New York.
1982-06-30 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1982-07-01 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1982-07-01 Changed name to Albany Savings Bank Fsb .
1991-06-30 Changed name to Albany Savings Bank, Fsb .
1991-06-30 Acquired Champlain Valley Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Plattsburgh in Plattsburgh, New York.
1992-04-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1994-10-21 Acquired Ludlow Savings Bank in Ludlow, Massachusetts as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-06-10 Changed name to Albank, Fsb .
1996-01-03 Acquired Marble Bank in Rutland, Vermont.
1998-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Charter One Bank, F.S.B. in Cleveland, Ohio.
1999-05-28 Acquired Albank Commercial in Albany, New York.
1999-10-01 Acquired St Paul Federal Bank For Savings in Chicago, Illinois.
2001-07-02 Acquired Liberty Federal Bank in Hinsdale, Illinois.
2002-05-07 Changed name to Charter One Bank, National Association .
2002-05-07 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2002-05-07 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2002-05-07 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2002-05-16 Acquired Charter One Commercial in Albany, New York.
2002-08-09 Acquired Charter Bank in Wyandotte, Michigan.
2003-07-11 Acquired Advance Bank in Lansing, Illinois.
2007-02-01 Acquired Greatbank Chicago in Skokie, Illinois.
2007-02-01 Acquired First National Bank in Chicago Heights, Illinois.
2007-02-01 Acquired Greatbank in Algonquin, Illinois.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Heritage Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Heritage Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Heritage Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-332

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.