Hiawatha National Bank

Wisconsin – Pierce – Hager City

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

13058

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 13058
FDIC's unique number: 8254
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Eau Claire

Federal Reserve ID Number: 505550
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15698

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-09-22

1917-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Hiawatha National Bank.
1998-02-28 Acquired First National Bank Of Glenwood in Glenwood City, Wisconsin.

Total assets: $79,885,000
Total deposits: $64,525,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $64,525,000
Equity capital: $14,958,000

Net income: $102,000

Return on Assets: 0.26
Return on Equity: 1.7
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Lake Shore Wisconsin Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Hiawatha National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Hiawatha National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Hiawatha National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-76

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.