Highland Village State Bank

Texas – Harris – Houston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

17354

1954

FDIC Certificate Number: 17354
FDIC's unique number: 11363
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 139450
Report Date: 1973-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1954-08-12 Institution established. Original name: Highland Village State Bank.
1973-03-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Highland Village State Bank in Houston, Texas.
1975-02-19 Changed name to Highland Village Bank .
1976-01-01 Changed name to First City Bank Of Highland Village .
1988-04-20 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1988-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First City National Bank of Houston in Houston, Texas.
1988-12-15 Acquired First City National Bank Of Richmond in Richmond, Texas.
1989-03-31 Changed name to First City, Texas - Houston, National Association .
1992-10-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New First City, Texas - Houston, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1993-02-13 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Texas Commerce Bank National Association in Houston, Texas.
1993-10-15 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - Rio Grande Valley, National Association in Mcallen, Texas.
1993-11-13 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1993-11-13 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-odessa, National Association in Odessa, Texas.
1993-11-13 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-midland, National Association in Midland, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank - Beaumont, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-new Braunfels, National Association in New Braunfels, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-austin, National Association in Austin, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1993-12-10 Acquired Texas Commerce Bank-san Antonio, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1993-12-17 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1994-04-14 Acquired Cullen/frost Bank Of Dallas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-01-20 Changed name to Chase Bank Of Texas, National Association .
2000-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Chase Manhattan Bank in New York City, New York.
2001-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas-san Angelo, National Association in San Angelo, Texas.
2001-11-10 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank .
2001-11-10 Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2004-11-13 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association .
2004-11-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Highland Village State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Highland Village State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Highland Village State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-347

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.