Home National Bank

Arizona – Maricopa – Scottsdale

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

34327

1997

FDIC Certificate Number: 34327
FDIC's unique number: 57086
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2463672
Report Date: 2001-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23108
The date of the last data update: 2002-04-11

1997-01-14 Institution established. Original name: Home National Bank.
2001-05-14 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2002-03-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Home National Bank in Blackwell, Oklahoma.
2010-07-09 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of RCB Bank in Claremore, Oklahoma.
2010-07-09 FDIC closing information for Home National Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/homenatlok.html.
2011-05-06 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2011-05-06 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.

Total assets: $66,039,000
Total deposits: $50,093,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Home National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Home National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-459

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.