HomeTrust Bank

North Carolina – Haywood – Clyde

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

27677

1926

FDIC Certificate Number: 27677
FDIC's unique number: 40511
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Charlotte

Federal Reserve ID Number: 212577
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 714E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 20
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1926-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Clyde Savings And Loan Association.
1990-04-04 Changed name to Clyde Savings Bank .
1992-07-01 Changed name to Clyde Savings Bank, SSB .
1992-07-01 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1996-06-11 Changed name to The Hometown Bank .
1996-06-11 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
1996-10-01 Acquired Tryon Federal Savings And Loan Association in Tryon, North Carolina.
1998-02-28 Acquired Shelby Savings Bank in Shelby, North Carolina.
2003-07-28 Changed name to Hometrust Bank .
2005-03-31 Acquired Home Savings Bank in Eden, North Carolina.
2010-01-31 Acquired Industrial Federal Savings Bank in Lexington, North Carolina.
2010-10-01 Acquired Cherryville Federal Savings And Loan Association in Cherryville, North Carolina.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $1,638,631,000
Total deposits: $1,272,222,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,272,222,000
Equity capital: $168,757,000

Net income: $-14,084,000

Return on Assets: -1.7
Return on Equity: -15.75
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

HomeTrust Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with HomeTrust Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and HomeTrust Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6148

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.