Interstate National Bank

Texas – Dallas – Dallas

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

27007

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27007
FDIC's unique number: 36442
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 846057
Report Date: 1995-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21024
The date of the last data update: 1995-08-21

1987-07-07 Institution established. Original name: Interstate National Bank.
1995-07-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fidelity Bank, National Association in University Park, Texas.
1996-11-22 Moved bank headquarters from Dallas, Texas to University Park, Texas.
1998-02-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Compass Bank in Houston, Texas.
1998-08-01 Acquired Hill Country Bank in Austin, Texas.
1998-10-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Compass Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
1999-08-26 Acquired Arizona Bank in Tucson, Arizona.
1999-10-21 Acquired Hartland Bank, National Association in Austin, Texas.
2000-01-14 Acquired Western Bank in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
2000-04-04 Acquired Compass Bank-co in Englewood, Colorado.
2000-07-18 Acquired Founders Bank Of Arizona in Scottsdale, Arizona.
2001-01-05 Acquired Firstate Bank in Kimball, Nebraska.
2001-01-05 Acquired Firstier Bank in Northglenn, Colorado.
2006-03-25 Acquired Texasbank in Fort Worth, Texas.
2008-03-13 Acquired The Laredo National Bank in Laredo, Texas.
2008-03-13 Acquired Texas State Bank in Mcallen, Texas.
2008-03-13 Acquired State National Bank in Fort Worth, Texas.
2009-08-21 Acquired Guaranty Bank in Austin, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-11 Acquired Bbva Bancomer Usa in Diamond Bar, California.
2009-09-11 Acquired Central Bank Of The South in Anniston, Alabama.

Total assets: $38,029,000
Total deposits: $33,877,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Interstate National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Interstate National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Interstate National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-486

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.