Irvine City Bank, FSB

California – Orange – East Irvine

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32222

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32222
FDIC's unique number: 45056
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Orange

Federal Reserve ID Number: 963972
Report Date: 1995-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-21

1984-06-08 Institution established. Original name: Irvine City Savings And Loan Association.
1990-01-24 Changed name to Irvine City Bank, Fsb .
1990-01-24 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-08-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank & Trust in Santa Ana, California.
1996-01-16 Acquired La Cumbre Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Santa Barbara, California.
1996-04-15 Acquired Queen City Bank, National Association in Long Beach, California.
1996-08-09 Moved bank headquarters from Santa Ana, California to Irvine, California.
1998-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Irvine, California to Newport Beach, California.
1998-09-15 Acquired Republic Bank in Torrance, California.
1999-12-31 Acquired Century Bank in Beverly Hills, California.
2000-08-31 Acquired Bank Of Ventura in Ventura, California.
2000-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank & Trust in San Francisco, California.
2000-12-29 Acquired Millennium Bank in San Francisco, California.
2001-03-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank & Trust in San Francisco, California.
2001-10-16 Acquired Charter Pacific Bank in Agoura Hills, California.
2001-10-31 Acquired Byl Bank Group in Orange, California.
2003-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Bank in Creve Coeur, Missouri.
2004-07-30 Acquired Continental Community Bank And Trust Company in Aurora, Illinois.
2004-12-01 Acquired Cib Bank in Hillside, Illinois.
2005-04-30 Acquired First Bank Of The Americas, S.S.B. in Chicago, Illinois.
2005-09-30 Acquired International Bank Of California in Los Angeles, California.
2005-11-01 Acquired Northway State Bank in Grayslake, Illinois.
2006-01-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Sachse in Sachse, Texas.
2006-04-29 Acquired Community Bank Of Pittsfield in Pittsfield, Illinois.
2006-05-17 Acquired First Independent National Bank in Plano, Texas.
2006-08-16 Acquired San Diego Community Bank in Chula Vista, California.
2006-09-01 Acquired Oak Lawn Bank in Oak Lawn, Illinois.
2007-03-01 Acquired Royal Oaks Bank, Ssb in Houston, Texas.
2007-12-01 Acquired Coast Bank Of Florida in Bradenton, Florida.

Total assets: $81,207,000
Total deposits: $62,821,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Irvine City Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Irvine City Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Irvine City Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-177

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.