Jersey Shore State Bank

Pennsylvania – Lycoming – Jersey Shore

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember


Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0


(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember




FDIC Certificate Number: 14359
FDIC's unique number: 8973
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 732918
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 14
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1934-05-12 Institution established. Original name: Jersey Shore State Bank.
1995-04-07 Acquired Lock Haven Savings Bank in Lock Haven, Pennsylvania.
1999-01-11 Acquired The First National Bank Of Spring Mills in Spring Mills, Pennsylvania.

Total assets: $734,939,000
Total deposits: $572,556,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $572,556,000
Equity capital: $61,147,000

Net income: $5,790,000

Return on Assets: 1.65
Return on Equity: 20.3
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Penns Woods Bancorp, Inc.

No associations



Say what you really think

Search for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.


Jersey Shore State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Jersey Shore State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our community. Your opinion is very important and Jersey Shore State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating


Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4632

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.