JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association

Ohio – Franklin – Columbus

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

628

1824

FDIC Certificate Number: 628
FDIC's unique number: 417
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 852218
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 8

Number of Domestic Offices: 5464
Number of Foreign Offices: 197
The date of the last data update: 2010-09-23

1824-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Chemical Bank.
1975-01-18 Acquired Security National Bank in Hempstead, New York.
1975-11-10 Acquired Chemical Bank Of Suffolk, National Association in Smithtown, New York.
1977-04-01 Acquired Chemical Bank Hudson Valley, National Association in Nyack, New York.
1978-10-01 Acquired Chemical Bank - Eastern, National Association in Greenwich, New York.
1978-10-01 Acquired Chemical Bank Of Rochester in Hilton, New York.
1978-10-01 Acquired Chemical Bank-buffalo in Buffalo, New York.
1978-10-01 Acquired Chemical Bank Of Syracuse in Syracuse, New York.
1978-10-01 Acquired Chemical Bank Of Binghamton in Binghamton, New York.
1991-07-19 Acquired Ensign Federal Savings Bank in New York City, New York.
1991-11-08 Acquired Community National Bank And Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
1992-03-07 Acquired Chemical Bank Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
1992-03-13 Acquired Central Federal Savings Bank in Mineola, New York.
1992-06-20 Acquired Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1993-07-01 Acquired Texas Commerce Banks in Newark, Delaware.
1996-07-14 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank in New York City, New York.
1996-07-14 Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Bank .
1996-12-01 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank, National Association in Morristown, New Jersey.
1998-10-01 Acquired Morgan Stanley Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1999-03-05 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2001-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas-san Angelo, National Association in San Angelo, Texas.
2001-11-10 Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2001-11-10 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank .
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association .
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-11-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.

Total assets: $1791060000,000
Total deposits: $1144158000,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $743,268,000,000
Equity capital: $125,374,000,000

Net income: $5,584,000,000

Return on Assets: 0.65
Return on Equity: 9
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Jpmorgan Chase & Co.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-137

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.