Leiters Ford State Bank

Indiana – Fulton – Rochester

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8039

1907

FDIC Certificate Number: 8039
FDIC's unique number: 5116
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 344544
Report Date: 1987-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1907-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Leiters Ford State Bank.
1982-05-24 Moved bank headquarters from Leiters Ford, Indiana to Rochester, Indiana.
1987-08-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Liberty Bank and Trust Company in Warsaw, Indiana.
1988-10-03 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Trustcorp Bank, Goshen in Goshen, Indiana.
1990-02-19 Changed name to Society Bank, Goshen .
1990-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society Bank, Indiana in South Bend, Indiana.
1992-10-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society National Bank, Indiana in South Bend, Indiana.
1995-03-10 Acquired Citizens Banking Company in Anderson, Indiana.
1996-01-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society National Bank, Indiana in Angola, Indiana.
1996-02-12 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1996-06-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1996-06-17 Moved bank headquarters from Angola, Indiana to Bryan, Ohio.
1997-06-23 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Naples, Florida.
1997-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $21,680,000
Total deposits: $21,761,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Leiters Ford State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Leiters Ford State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Leiters Ford State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-312

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.