Liberty FSB

Oklahoma – Garfield – Enid

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

28407

1918

FDIC Certificate Number: 28407
FDIC's unique number: 41241
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 284574
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 702E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1918-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Liberty Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1983-05-31 Acquired Cherokee Federal Savings And Loan Association in Cherokee, Oklahoma.
1988-04-30 Changed name to Liberty Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Enid .
1990-10-31 Changed name to Liberty Fsb .
1990-10-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1998-09-23 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $133,592,000
Total deposits: $127,441,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $127,441,000
Equity capital: $5,438,000

Net income: $41,000

Return on Assets: 0.06
Return on Equity: 1.5
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Liberty FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Liberty FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Liberty FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-452

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.