LibertyPointe Bank

New York – New York – New York City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

58071

2005

FDIC Certificate Number: 58071
FDIC's unique number: 438820
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 3382921
Report Date: 2009-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-03-12

2005-10-03 Institution established. Original name: Libertypointe Bank.
2010-03-11 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Valley National Bank in Wayne, New Jersey.
2010-03-11 FDIC closing information for Libertypointe Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/LibertyPointe.html.

Total assets: $216,500,000
Total deposits: $209,477,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

LibertyPointe Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with LibertyPointe Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and LibertyPointe Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-69

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.