Los Robles Bank

California – Ventura – Thousand Oaks

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

27008

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27008
FDIC's unique number: 36443
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 366667
Report Date: 2001-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2001-08-01

1987-07-02 Institution established. Original name: Los Robles National Bank.
1992-06-12 Changed name to Los Robles Bank .
1992-06-12 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2001-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Santa Barbara Bank & Trust in Santa Barbara, California.
2002-03-29 Changed name to Pacific Capital Bank, National Association .
2002-03-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2002-03-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2002-03-29 Acquired First National Bank Of Central California in Salinas, California.
2002-03-29 Reorganized.
2004-03-05 Acquired Pacific Crest Bank in Agoura Hills, California.
2005-08-01 Acquired First Bank Of San Luis Obispo in San Luis Obispo, California.
2011-05-26 Changed name to Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association .

Total assets: $178,308,000
Total deposits: $163,005,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Los Robles Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Los Robles Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Los Robles Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-483

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.