Madison Bank

Kansas – Greenwood – Madison

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

10510

1885

FDIC Certificate Number: 10510
FDIC's unique number: 6728
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wichita

Federal Reserve ID Number: 151256
Report Date: 1985-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-28

1885-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Madison Bank.
1985-07-02 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Madison in Madison, Kansas.
1989-12-29 Moved bank headquarters from Madison, Kansas to Emporia, Kansas.
1991-12-03 Changed name to First National Bank .
1997-10-03 Changed name to First Community Bank .
1997-10-03 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.

Total assets: $8,392,000
Total deposits: $7,739,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Madison Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Madison Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Madison Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-409

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.