Manufacturers Bank of Florida

Florida – Hillsborough – Tampa

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26560

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26560
FDIC's unique number: 35259
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 269432
Report Date: 2001-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-02-07

1986-02-03 Institution established. Original name: Manufacturers Bank Of Florida.
1999-06-23 Reorganized.
1999-06-25 Acquired Partners Bank Of Florida, Fsb in Tampa, Florida.
2001-12-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Israel Discount Bank of New York in New York, New York.
2002-01-11 Acquired Hamilton Bank, National Association in Miami, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $296,181,000
Total deposits: $212,926,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Manufacturers Bank of Florida does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Manufacturers Bank of Florida, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Manufacturers Bank of Florida will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-157

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.