Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company/Mid-Hudson

New York – Orange – Monroe

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

5932

1915

FDIC Certificate Number: 5932
FDIC's unique number: 4033
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 58001
Report Date: 1976-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-11-09

1915-03-17 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank Of Monroe.
1973-10-01 Changed name to Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company/mid-hudson .
1976-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1976-07-30 Acquired Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company/suffolk, National Association in Bay Shore, New York.
1985-12-31 Acquired Manufacturers Hanover, National Association in Rochester, New York.
1992-06-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Chemical Bank in New York City, New York.
1993-07-01 Acquired Texas Commerce Banks in Newark, Delaware.
1996-07-14 Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Bank .
1996-07-14 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank in New York City, New York.
1996-12-01 Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank, National Association in Morristown, New Jersey.
1998-10-01 Acquired Morgan Stanley Trust Company in New York City, New York.
1999-03-05 Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2001-08-01 Acquired Chase Bank Of Texas-san Angelo, National Association in San Angelo, Texas.
2001-11-10 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank .
2001-11-10 Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2004-11-13 Changed name to Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association .
2004-11-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2004-11-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2004-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Columbus, Ohio.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Acquired Bank One, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $39,813,000
Total deposits: $36,578,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company/Mid-Hudson does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company/Mid-Hudson, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company/Mid-Hudson will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-371

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.