Marine View Federal Savings Bank

New Jersey – Monmouth – Middletown

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

33523

1991

FDIC Certificate Number: 33523
FDIC's unique number: 47362
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 645979
Report Date: 1993-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02

1991-11-01 Institution established. Original name: Marine View Federal Savings Bank.
1991-11-01 Acquired Marine View Savings Bank, Sla in Middletown, New Jersey.
1993-08-06 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Summit Bank in Summit, New Jersey.
1994-09-13 Acquired Crestmont Federal Savings And Loan Association in Edison, New Jersey.
1996-01-16 Acquired Garden State Bank in Jackson, New Jersey.
1996-07-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
1997-02-08 Acquired Central Jersey Savings Bank, Sla in East Brunswick, New Jersey.
1997-06-07 Acquired The Bank Of Mid-jersey in Bordentown, New Jersey.
1998-03-14 Acquired Collective Bank in Egg Harbor, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $84,726,000
Total deposits: $87,750,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Marine View Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Marine View Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Marine View Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-304

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.