Maxim Bank

Texas – Galveston – Dickinson

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

9017

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 9017
FDIC's unique number: 5759
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 576158
Report Date: 2003-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-10-31

1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens State Bank Of Dickinson, Texas.
1990-06-28 Acquired Bacliff Bank, National Association in Bacliff, Texas.
2001-05-11 Acquired League City Bank & Trust in League City, Texas.
2001-05-11 Changed name to Maxim Bank .
2003-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southwest Bank of Texas National Association in Houston, Texas.
2004-01-31 Acquired Lone Star Bank in Dallas, Texas.
2004-10-01 Acquired Klein Bank in Spring, Texas.
2005-03-07 Changed name to Amegy Bank National Association .
2007-09-05 Acquired Intercontinental National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.

Total assets: $312,018,000
Total deposits: $242,035,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Maxim Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Maxim Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Maxim Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26466

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.