Merchants Bank, National Association

Minnesota – Winona – Winona

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

8866

1875

FDIC Certificate Number: 8866
FDIC's unique number: 5660
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 779351
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14488

Number of Domestic Offices: 18
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-11-23

1875-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Merchants National Bank Of Winona.
2001-09-01 Changed name to Merchants Bank, National Association .
2007-09-20 Acquired Merchants Bank, National Association in Hampton, Minnesota.
2007-09-20 Acquired The First National Bank In Cannon Falls in Cannon Falls, Minnesota.
2009-06-28 Acquired Merchants Bank, National Association in Caledonia, Minnesota.
2009-06-28 Acquired Merchants Bank, National Association in La Crescent, Minnesota.

Total assets: $1,135,552,000
Total deposits: $890,752,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $890,752,000
Equity capital: $138,257,000

Net income: $6,695,000

Return on Assets: 1.16
Return on Equity: 9.92
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Merchants Financial Group, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Merchants Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Merchants Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merchants Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-415

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.