Merchants & Planters Bank

South Carolina – Fairfield – Winnsboro

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

11540

1911

FDIC Certificate Number: 11540
FDIC's unique number: 7373
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Sc

Federal Reserve ID Number: 175926
Report Date: 1973-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1911-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Merchants & Planters Bank.
1973-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southern Bank and Trust Company in Greenville, South Carolina.
1974-07-01 Acquired The Bank Of Commerce in Prosperity, South Carolina.
1974-09-20 Acquired American Bank & Trust in Orangeburg, South Carolina.
1977-10-31 Acquired Morgan Bank And Trust in Spartanburg, South Carolina.
1982-09-16 Acquired Guaranty Bank And Trust Company in Florence, South Carolina.
1986-04-07 Changed name to First Union National Bank Of South Carolina .
1993-02-19 Acquired South Carolina Federal Savings Bank in Columbia, South Carolina.
1995-10-06 Acquired Home Federal Savings Bank Of South Carolina in Rock Hill, South Carolina.
1995-10-06 Acquired United Savings Bank, Fsb in Greenwood, South Carolina.
1997-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Merchants & Planters Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Merchants & Planters Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merchants & Planters Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.