Merchants State Bank

Texas – Rusk – Mount Enterprise

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13672

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 13672
FDIC's unique number: 8546
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 109864
Report Date: 1991-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-01-27

1908-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Merchants & Planters State Bank.
1985-03-20 Changed name to Merchants State Bank .
1992-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens National Bank of Henderson in Henderson, Texas.
1994-11-15 Changed name to Citizens National Bank .
1998-07-23 Acquired First State Bank in Waskom, Texas.
1998-12-11 Acquired Jefferson National Bank in Jefferson, Texas.
2001-10-26 Acquired Peoples State Bank in Henderson, Texas.

Total assets: $23,894,000
Total deposits: $21,520,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Merchants State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Merchants State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merchants State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-325

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.