Merchants State Bank of North Branch

Minnesota – Chisago – North Branch

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8540

1903

FDIC Certificate Number: 8540
FDIC's unique number: 5448
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 722656
Report Date: 1999-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-07-27

1903-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Merchants State Bank Of North Branch.
1999-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Hudson in Woodbury, Minnesota.
2007-06-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Associated Bank, National Association in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Woodbury, Minnesota to Green Bay, Wisconsin.

Total assets: $52,966,000
Total deposits: $44,818,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Merchants State Bank of North Branch does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Merchants State Bank of North Branch, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Merchants State Bank of North Branch will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-134

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.