Metlife Bank, National Association

New Jersey – Morris – Morristown

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

35055

1999

FDIC Certificate Number: 35055
FDIC's unique number: 74359
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2777650
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23743

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-03-09

1999-02-23 Institution established. Original name: Grand Bank National Association.
2001-02-28 Changed name to Metlife Bank, National Association .
2001-05-14 Moved bank headquarters from Kingston, New Jersey to Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2002-01-01 Acquired Metlife Trust Company, National Association in Bedminster, New Jersey.
2002-01-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2011-02-14 Moved bank headquarters from Bridgewater, New Jersey to Convent Station, New Jersey.

Total assets: $16,490,790,000
Total deposits: $10,021,687,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $10,021,687,000
Equity capital: $1,285,210,000

Net income: $11,836,000

Return on Assets: 0.15
Return on Equity: 1.86
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Metlife, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Metlife Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Metlife Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Metlife Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-472

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.