Michigan National Bank

Michigan – Ingham – Lansing

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

13980

1934

FDIC Certificate Number: 13980
FDIC's unique number: 8743
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Detroit

Federal Reserve ID Number: 519940
Report Date: 1986-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14032
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Michigan National Bank.
1987-03-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Michigan National Bank in Farmington Hills, Michigan.
1987-03-31 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1987-08-31 Acquired Michigan Bank - Livingston in Brighton, Michigan.
1987-10-30 Acquired Michigan National Bank-michiana in Cassopolis, Michigan.
1988-10-03 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Terminated to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1997-08-31 Acquired Michigan Bank, Federal Savings Bank in Troy, Michigan.
2001-10-06 Changed name to Standard Federal Bank National Association .
2001-10-06 Moved bank headquarters from Farmington Hills, Michigan to Troy, Michigan.
2001-10-06 Acquired Standard Federal Bank in Troy, Michigan.
2005-09-12 Changed name to Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association .
2008-10-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $1,750,124,000
Total deposits: $1,449,501,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Michigan National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Michigan National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Michigan National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-320

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.