Millennium State Bank of Texas

Texas – Dallas – Dallas

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

57667

2003

FDIC Certificate Number: 57667
FDIC's unique number: 419341
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 3194179
Report Date: 2009-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-07-06

2003-08-20 Institution established. Original name: Millennium State Bank Of Texas.
2009-07-02 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of State Bank of Texas in Irving, Texas.
2009-07-02 FDIC closing information for Millennium State Bank Of Texas : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/millennium.html.

Total assets: $118,601,000
Total deposits: $115,478,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Millennium State Bank of Texas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Millennium State Bank of Texas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Millennium State Bank of Texas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-193

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.