Minnwest Bank South

Minnesota – Murray – Slayton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8861

1930

FDIC Certificate Number: 8861
FDIC's unique number: 5655
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls

Federal Reserve ID Number: 892755
Report Date: 2001-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2001-06-19

1930-02-02 Institution established. Original name: Northwestern State Bank Of Slayton.
1983-05-01 Changed name to Norwest Bank Slayton .
1987-01-26 Reorganized.
1987-01-26 Changed name to Murray County State Bank .
1989-05-01 Acquired First State Bank Of Lake Wilson in Lake Wilson, Minnesota.
1997-09-03 Changed name to Minnwest Bank Slayton, Lake Wilson, Waseca .
1997-11-03 Changed name to Minnwest Bank South .
2001-05-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Minnwest Bank South in Tracy, Minnesota.

Total assets: $94,255,000
Total deposits: $82,389,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Minnwest Bank South does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Minnwest Bank South, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Minnwest Bank South will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-421

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.