Mountain Ridge State Bank

New Jersey – Essex – West Orange

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21619

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21619
FDIC's unique number: 14953
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 690401
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-15

1974-06-10 Institution established. Original name: Mountain Ridge State Bank.
1990-10-05 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Mountain Ridge Bank in West Orange, New Jersey.
1991-04-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hub National Bank in North Bergen, New Jersey.
1991-08-12 Moved bank headquarters from North Bergen, New Jersey to West Orange, New Jersey.
1992-09-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hudson United Bank in Union City, New Jersey.
1994-07-01 Acquired Washington Savings Bank in Hoboken, New Jersey.
1995-04-05 Acquired Jefferson National Bank in Passaic, New Jersey.
1995-06-30 Acquired Urban National Bank in Franklin Lakes, New Jersey.
1996-01-12 Acquired Growth Bank in Basking Ridge, New Jersey.
1998-02-05 Acquired Security National Bank & Trust Company Of New Jersey in Newark, New Jersey.
1998-08-14 Acquired The Community National Bank Of New Jersey in Westmont, New Jersey.
1998-08-14 Acquired Inter-boro Savings And Loan Association in Cherry Hill, New Jersey.
1999-03-26 Acquired Lafayette American Bank in Bridgeport, Connecticut.
1999-03-26 Acquired Bank Of The Hudson in Poughkeepsie, New York.
1999-05-20 Acquired Little Falls Bank in Little Falls, New Jersey.
1999-08-10 Moved bank headquarters from Union City, New Jersey to Mahwah, New Jersey.
1999-12-01 Acquired The Farmers And Merchants National Bank Of Bridgeton in Bridgeton, New Jersey.
1999-12-01 Acquired Jefferson Bank in Haverford, Pennsylvania.
1999-12-01 Acquired Jefferson Bank Of New Jersey in Mount Laurel, New Jersey.
2002-06-28 Acquired Connecticut Bank Of Commerce in Stamford, Connecticut as part of a government assisted transaction.
2006-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TD BankNorth, National Association in Portland, Maine.
2007-01-01 Acquired Interchange Bank in Saddle Brook, New Jersey.
2008-05-31 Changed name to Td Bank, National Association .
2008-05-31 Moved bank headquarters from Portland, Maine to Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank/north in Ramsey, New Jersey.
2010-04-16 Acquired Riverside National Bank Of Florida in Fort Pierce, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired First Federal Bank Of North Florida in Palatka, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired Americanfirst Bank in Clermont, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-09-30 Acquired Carolina First Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.

Total assets: $51,426,000
Total deposits: $50,209,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Mountain Ridge State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Mountain Ridge State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mountain Ridge State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-53

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.