National City Bank of Pennsylvania

Pennsylvania – Allegheny – Pittsburgh

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

7948

1857

FDIC Certificate Number: 7948
FDIC's unique number: 5081
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 178020
Report Date: 2006-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23019
The date of the last data update: 2006-08-09

1857-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Union National Bank Of Pittsburgh.
1970-01-02 Acquired Peoples Union Bank And Trust Company, National Association in Mckeesport, Pennsylvania.
1991-08-23 Changed name to Integra National Bank/pittsburgh .
1992-09-24 Acquired Landmark Savings Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1993-04-23 Acquired Equibank in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1993-04-23 Changed name to Integra Bank/pittsburgh .
1995-01-06 Acquired Lincoln Savings Bank in Carnegie, Pennsylvania.
1995-05-26 Acquired Integra Bank/north in Sharon, Pennsylvania.
1995-05-26 Changed name to Integra Bank .
1995-05-26 Acquired Integra Bank/south in Uniontown, Pennsylvania.
1996-05-31 Acquired Integra Trust Company, National Association in Punxsutawney, Pennsylvania.
1996-05-31 Changed name to National City Bank, Pennsylvania .
1996-05-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2000-05-24 Changed name to National City Bank Of Pennsylvania .
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.

Total assets: $15,091,736,000
Total deposits: $13,512,152,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

National City Bank of Pennsylvania does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with National City Bank of Pennsylvania, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and National City Bank of Pennsylvania will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-386

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.