National Motors Bank FSB

Pennsylvania – Montgomery – Fort Washington

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

35054

2001

FDIC Certificate Number: 35054
FDIC's unique number: 74358
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia

Federal Reserve ID Number: 3536948
Report Date: 2008-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2009-03-26

2001-08-22 Institution established. Original name: Gmac Bank.
2004-07-09 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2006-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Greenville, Delaware to Horsham, Pennsylvania.
2006-11-22 Changed name to National Motors Bank Fsb .
2007-07-23 Moved bank headquarters from Horsham, Pennsylvania to Fort Washington, Pennsylvania.
2009-02-26 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Total assets: $7,735,000
Total deposits: $0,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

National Motors Bank FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with National Motors Bank FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and National Motors Bank FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-471

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.