NBG Clayton Bank

Georgia – Clayton – Riverdale

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19970

1969

FDIC Certificate Number: 19970
FDIC's unique number: 13712
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 713636
Report Date: 1983-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1969-06-09 Institution established. Original name: Clayton County Bank.
1982-12-31 Changed name to Nbg Clayton Bank .
1983-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The National Bank of Georgia in Atlanta, Georgia.
1987-01-01 Changed name to First American Bank Of Georgia, National Association .
1992-05-29 Changed name to First American Bank Of Georgia, National Association .
1993-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank of Georgia in Atlanta, Georgia.
1994-08-12 Acquired Cobb Federal Savings Association in Marietta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-08-09 Acquired Home Federal Savings Bank in Rome, Georgia.
1997-06-02 Reorganized.
1997-06-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Virginia in Roanoke County, Virginia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union Bank Of Connecticut in Stamford, Connecticut.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Maryland in Rockville, Maryland.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Washington, D.c. in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Tennessee in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $62,205,000
Total deposits: $40,631,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

NBG Clayton Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with NBG Clayton Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and NBG Clayton Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-213

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.