New York National Bank

New York – Bronx – Bronx

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

23713

1982

FDIC Certificate Number: 23713
FDIC's unique number: 16583
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 99004
Report Date: 2009-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24791
The date of the last data update: 2010-03-31

1982-02-22 Institution established. Original name: New York National Bank.
2006-01-01 Changed name to Nynb Bank .
2006-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2006-01-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2007-11-19 Changed name to New York National Bank .
2007-11-19 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2007-11-19 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2010-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hudson Valley Bank, National Association in Stamford, Connecticut.

Total assets: $135,398,000
Total deposits: $118,265,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

New York National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with New York National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and New York National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-482

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.