North County Bank

Washington – Snohomish – Arlington

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

35053

1999

FDIC Certificate Number: 35053
FDIC's unique number: 74357
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Seattle

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2796017
Report Date: 2010-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-09-27

1999-04-01 Institution established. Original name: North County Bank.
2010-09-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Whidbey Island Bank in Coupeville, Washington.
2010-09-24 FDIC closing information for North County Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/northcounty.html.

Total assets: $288,776,000
Total deposits: $276,081,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

North County Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with North County Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North County Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-474

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.