North Georgia Bank

Georgia – Cherokee – Canton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26833

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26833
FDIC's unique number: 36059
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 923172
Report Date: 1987-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1986-10-24 Institution established. Original name: North Georgia Bank.
1988-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Atlanta in Atlanta, Georgia.
1989-09-15 Acquired First Bank And Trust Company in Fayetteville, Georgia.
1990-06-22 Acquired Great Southern Federal Savings And Loan Association in Savannah, Georgia.
1991-05-20 Changed name to Wachovia Bank Of Georgia, National Association .
1996-04-01 Moved bank headquarters from Atlanta, Georgia to Augusta, Georgia.
1996-04-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Henry County in Stockbridge, Georgia.
1996-04-01 Reorganized.
1996-04-26 Acquired Southern Heritage Savings Bank in Athens, Georgia.
1997-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
1998-03-20 Acquired Jefferson National Bank in Charlottesville, Virginia.
1998-03-20 Acquired Central Fidelity National Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-07-01 Acquired 1st United Bank in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-05-11 Acquired Bank Of Canton in Canton, Georgia.
2000-10-19 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce in Winter Park, Florida.
2001-08-24 Acquired Republic Security Bank in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2002-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $58,780,000
Total deposits: $53,473,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

North Georgia Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with North Georgia Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Georgia Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-434

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.