North Middletown Deposit Bank

Kentucky – Bourbon – North Middletown

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13678

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 13678
FDIC's unique number: 8551
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 490713
Report Date: 1983-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1869-01-01 Institution established. Original name: North Middletown Deposit Bank.
1983-04-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bourbon-Agricultural Bank & Trust Company in Paris, Kentucky.
1984-10-29 Changed name to Bourbon Agricultural Deposit Bank & Trust Company .
1984-10-29 Acquired Peoples Deposit Bank & Trust Company in Paris, Kentucky.
1994-08-15 Changed name to Kentucky Bank .
1996-05-10 Acquired Kentucky Savings Bank, Fsb in Georgetown, Kentucky.
1996-09-21 Acquired Jessamine First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Nicholasville, Kentucky.
2003-11-07 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank in Cynthiana, Kentucky.
2006-07-08 Acquired Peoples Bank in Morehead, Kentucky.

Total assets: $7,021,000
Total deposits: $6,511,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

North Middletown Deposit Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with North Middletown Deposit Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Middletown Deposit Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-324

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.