Northbrook Bank and Trust Company

Illinois – Cook – Northbrook

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

57082

2000

FDIC Certificate Number: 57082
FDIC's unique number: 356990
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2938198
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 13
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-11

2000-11-22 Institution established. Original name: Northbrook Bank And Trust Company.
2010-04-23 Acquired Lincoln Park Savings Bank in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-06 Acquired Ravenswood Bank in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-02-04 Acquired Community First Bank - Chicago in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-08 Acquired First Chicago Bank & Trust in Chicago, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $1,244,443,000
Total deposits: $1,052,533,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,052,533,000
Equity capital: $98,551,000

Net income: $3,927,000

Return on Assets: 0.65
Return on Equity: 8.13
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Wintrust Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Northbrook Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Northbrook Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Northbrook Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-207

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.