Northern State Bank

Pennsylvania – Bradford – Towanda

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

35210

1999

FDIC Certificate Number: 35210
FDIC's unique number: 76177
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Harrisburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2821825
Report Date: 2002-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-01-28

1999-07-06 Institution established. Original name: Northern State Bank.
2003-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Legacy Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2006-05-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Pennsylvania in Greenville, Pennsylvania.
2008-04-01 Acquired Omega Bank in Huntingdon, Pennsylvania.
2008-08-15 Acquired Iron And Glass Bank in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2011-01-01 Acquired Community Bank & Trust Company in Clarks Summit, Pennsylvania.

Total assets: $86,414,000
Total deposits: $74,828,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Northern State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Northern State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Northern State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-258

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.