Norwest Bank Minnesota Central, National Association

Minnesota – Stearns – Saint Cloud

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

9755

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 9755
FDIC's unique number: 6242
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 744751
Report Date: 1995-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14622
The date of the last data update: 1996-01-03

1917-09-01 Institution established. Original name: St. Cloud National Bank & Trust Co.
1994-01-01 Reorganized.
1994-03-04 Acquired Norwest Bank Minnesota Central, National Association in St. Cloud, Minnesota.
1994-03-04 Changed name to Norwest Bank Minnesota Central, National Association .
1995-02-17 Acquired Community State Bank Of Alexandria in Alexandria, Minnesota.
1995-11-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norwest Bank Minnesota South, National Association in Rochester, Minnesota.
1998-09-12 Acquired Norwest Bank North Country, National Association in Brainerd, Minnesota.
1998-10-17 Acquired Midamerica Bank South in Mankato, Minnesota.
1999-03-06 Acquired First National Bank Of Monticello in Monticello, Minnesota.
2000-07-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2000-08-26 Acquired Norwest Bank Minnesota West, National Association in Moorhead, Minnesota.
2000-08-26 Acquired Norwest Bank Minnesota Southwest, National Association in Marshall, Minnesota.
2001-01-13 Acquired The Buffalo National Bank in Buffalo, Minnesota.
2002-07-13 Acquired Marquette Bank, National Association in Rogers, Minnesota.
2002-07-13 Acquired Marquette Capital Bank, National Association in Wayzata, Minnesota.
2004-02-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $459,356,000
Total deposits: $412,891,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Norwest Bank Minnesota Central, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Norwest Bank Minnesota Central, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Norwest Bank Minnesota Central, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-226

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.