Odessa Savings Association

Texas – Ector – Odessa

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30336

1947

FDIC Certificate Number: 30336
FDIC's unique number: 43170
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock

Federal Reserve ID Number: 118978
Report Date: 1988-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-01-01

1947-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Odessa Savings Association.
1982-07-31 Acquired West Texas Savings Association in Lubbock, Texas.
1988-10-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Olney Savings and Loan Association in Olney, Texas.
1989-10-02 Moved bank headquarters from Odessa, Texas to Olney, Texas.
1989-12-31 Changed name to Amwest Savings Association .
1994-03-14 Moved bank headquarters from Olney, Texas to Bryan, Texas.
1994-07-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1994-07-01 Changed name to First American Bank, S.S.B. .
1994-07-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1996-07-25 Changed name to First American Bank Texas, SSB .
1998-04-17 Acquired Austin National Bank in Austin, Texas.
2000-03-01 Acquired The Burkburnett Bank in Burkburnett, Texas.
2000-08-18 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2000-09-01 Changed name to First American Bank, SSB .
2000-09-01 Acquired First American Bank SSB in Bryan, Texas.
2003-12-11 Acquired Security Bank National Association in Garland, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed name to Citibank Texas, National Association .
2005-03-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2005-03-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2005-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Bryan, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Total assets: $132,133,000
Total deposits: $156,610,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Odessa Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Odessa Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Odessa Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-242

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.