One Valley Bank-East, National Association

West Virginia – Berkeley – Martinsburg

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6775

1892

FDIC Certificate Number: 6775
FDIC's unique number: 4552
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 761637
Report Date: 2000-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 4811
The date of the last data update: 2001-01-17

1892-10-29 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens National Bank Of Martinsburg.
1987-09-01 Changed name to One Valley Bank Of Martinsburg, National Association .
1994-04-11 Acquired One Valley Bank - East, National Association in Martinsburg, West Virginia.
1994-04-11 Changed name to One Valley Bank-east, National Association .
2000-11-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2001-03-16 Acquired Fcnb Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2001-05-12 Acquired First National Bank Of Northwest Georgia in Calhoun, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired Hardwick Bank & Trust Company in Dalton, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired First Bulloch Bank & Trust Company in Statesboro, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired Metter Banking Company in Metter, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired First National Bank Of Effingham in Springfield, Georgia.
2001-05-12 Acquired Wayne National Bank in Jesup, Georgia.
2001-07-13 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Athens, Tennessee in Athens, Tennessee.
2001-07-13 Acquired Bankfirst in Knoxville, Tennessee.
2001-07-13 Acquired Bankfirst Trust Company in Knoxville, Tennessee.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Fannin County, National Association in Blue Ridge, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Dahlonega in Dahlonega, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Danielsville in Danielsville, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Ellijay in Ellijay, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of The Coastal Region, National Association in Savannah, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Northeast Georgia, National Association in Gainesville, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Lavonia in Lavonia, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Alabama in Oxford, Alabama.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of The Carolinas in Waynesville, North Carolina.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Dawsonville in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Central Georgia, National Association in Macon, Georgia.
2001-11-09 Acquired Century South Bank Of Polk County in Copperhill, Tennessee.
2002-03-16 Acquired F & M Bank-west Virginia, Inc. in Ranson, West Virginia.
2002-03-16 Acquired F&m; Bank - Maryland, Inc. in Bethesda, Maryland.
2002-05-11 Acquired Community First Bank in Carrollton, Georgia.
2002-07-12 Acquired Area Trust Company in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-07-12 Acquired Area Bank in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-07-12 Acquired The Vine Street Trust Company in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-09-13 Acquired Bank Of Louisville in Louisville, Kentucky.
2002-11-08 Acquired First South Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2003-03-14 Acquired Equitable Bank in Wheaton, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Farmers Bank Of Maryland in Annapolis, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Atlantic Bank in Ocean City, Maryland.
2004-06-11 Acquired Republic Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2006-09-16 Acquired Main Street Bank in Covington, Georgia.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank in Ducktown, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Bank/first Citizens Bank in Cleveland, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank Of Tennessee in Maryville, Tennessee.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $471,945,000
Total deposits: $371,122,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

One Valley Bank-East, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with One Valley Bank-East, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and One Valley Bank-East, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-273

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.