Pacific Western National Bank

California – Los Angeles – Pico Rivera

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

23263

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23263
FDIC's unique number: 16301
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (North)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 652164
Report Date: 2001-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16912
The date of the last data update: 2002-03-14

1980-11-13 Institution established. Original name: Pacific Western National Bank.
2002-01-23 Reorganized.
2002-01-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pacific Western National Bank in Santa Monica, California.
2002-08-22 Acquired Upland Bank in Upland, California.
2002-08-23 Acquired Marathon National Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2003-08-22 Acquired Verdugo Banking Company in Glendale, California.
2004-04-16 Acquired Harbor National Bank in Newport Beach, California.
2005-08-12 Acquired First American Bank in Rosemead, California.
2005-10-07 Acquired Pacific Liberty Bank in Huntington Beach, California.
2006-01-04 Acquired Cedars Bank in Los Angeles, California.
2006-05-09 Acquired Foothill Independent Bank in Glendora, California.
2006-09-13 Changed name to Pacific Western Bank .
2006-09-13 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2006-09-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2006-10-26 Moved bank headquarters from Santa Monica, California to San Diego, California.
2006-10-26 Acquired First National Bank in Rancho Santa Fe, California.
2006-10-26 Acquired Community National Bank in Escondido, California.
2008-11-07 Acquired Security Pacific Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-28 Acquired Affinity Bank in Ventura, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-20 Acquired Los Padres Bank in Solvang, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-12-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Diego, California to Los Angeles, California.

Total assets: $258,554,000
Total deposits: $238,223,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Pacific Western National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Pacific Western National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pacific Western National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-266

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.