Palm Beach County Bank

Florida – Palm Beach – West Palm Beach

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

35211

1999

FDIC Certificate Number: 35211
FDIC's unique number: 76178
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2837189
Report Date: 2005-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2006-02-06

1999-09-13 Institution established. Original name: Palm Beach County Bank.
2004-01-20 Moved bank headquarters from Boynton Beach, Florida to West Palm Beach, Florida.
2005-12-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2006-01-02 Moved bank headquarters from West Palm Beach, Florida to Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2008-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TD Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-16 Acquired Riverside National Bank Of Florida in Fort Pierce, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired First Federal Bank Of North Florida in Palatka, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired Americanfirst Bank in Clermont, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-09-30 Acquired Carolina First Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.

Total assets: $373,279,000
Total deposits: $286,216,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Palm Beach County Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Palm Beach County Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Palm Beach County Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-259

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.