Palm Beach Federal Savings Association

Florida – Palm Beach – West Palm Beach

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

33752

1992

FDIC Certificate Number: 33752
FDIC's unique number: 47961
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 750471
Report Date: 1993-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02

1992-12-08 Institution established. Original name: Palm Beach Federal Savings Association.
1992-12-08 Acquired Palm Beach Federal Savings Bank in Palm Beach Gardens, Florida.
1993-10-08 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of SouthBank, a Federal Savings Bank in Palm Beach Gardens, Florida.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $40,689,000
Total deposits: $29,005,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Palm Beach Federal Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Palm Beach Federal Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Palm Beach Federal Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-238

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.