Pan American Federal Savings Bank

California – San Mateo – San Mateo

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

33756

1992

FDIC Certificate Number: 33756
FDIC's unique number: 47966
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Francisco

Federal Reserve ID Number: 524878
Report Date: 1994-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-02

1992-12-21 Institution established. Original name: Pan American Federal Savings Bank.
1992-12-21 Acquired Pan American Savings Bank in San Mateo, California.
1994-04-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Pan American Bank, FSB in San Mateo, California.
2005-02-05 Moved bank headquarters from San Mateo, California to Burlingame, California.
2005-02-07 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Total assets: $139,784,000
Total deposits: $120,551,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Pan American Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Pan American Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pan American Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-236

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.