Paramount Bank

Nevada – Clark – Las Vegas

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

58547

2007

FDIC Certificate Number: 58547
FDIC's unique number: 456007
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix

Federal Reserve ID Number: 3584538
Report Date: 2008-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2009-01-06

2007-07-09 Institution established. Original name: Paramount Bank.
2008-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Paramount Bank in Farmington Hills, Michigan.
2010-12-10 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Level One Bank in Farmington Hills, Michigan.
2010-12-10 FDIC closing information for Paramount Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/paramount.html.

Total assets: $24,614,000
Total deposits: $13,923,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Paramount Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Paramount Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Paramount Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-323

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.