People's State Bank of Mazeppa

Minnesota – Wabasha – Mazeppa

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

9753

1909

FDIC Certificate Number: 9753
FDIC's unique number: 6240
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 95453
Report Date: 1987-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: People's State Bank Of Mazeppa.
1987-08-21 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The First State Bank of Red Wing in Red Wing, Minnesota.
2004-01-14 Moved bank headquarters from Mazeppa, Minnesota to Red Wing, Minnesota.

Total assets: $21,613,000
Total deposits: $20,186,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

People's State Bank of Mazeppa does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with People's State Bank of Mazeppa, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and People's State Bank of Mazeppa will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-228

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.