Peoples Federal Savings Association

Iowa – Wapello – Ottumwa

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

33529

1991

FDIC Certificate Number: 33529
FDIC's unique number: 47379
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines

Federal Reserve ID Number: 232575
Report Date: 1991-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-25

1991-11-22 Institution established. Original name: Peoples Federal Savings Association.
1991-11-22 Acquired Peoples Federal Savings Bank in Ottumwa, Iowa.
1992-03-20 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of South Ottumwa Savings Bank in Ottumwa, Iowa.

Total assets: $32,229,000
Total deposits: $31,889,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Peoples Federal Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Peoples Federal Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Peoples Federal Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-296

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.