Peoples State Bank of Munising

Michigan – Alger – Munising

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember


Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0


(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember




FDIC Certificate Number: 15165
FDIC's unique number: 9532
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 262956
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1910-06-07 Institution established. Original name: Peoples State Bank Of Munising.
2002-06-30 Reorganized.

Total assets: $114,976,000
Total deposits: $86,029,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $86,029,000
Equity capital: $15,049,000

Net income: $545,000

Return on Assets: 0.94
Return on Equity: 7.43
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Peoples State Bancorp, Inc.

No associations



Say what you really think

Search for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.


Peoples State Bank of Munising does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Peoples State Bank of Munising, we encourage you to share that experience with our community. Your opinion is very important and Peoples State Bank of Munising will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now


Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-251

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.