Piedmont Federal Savings Bank

North Carolina – Forsyth – Winston Salem

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

27619

1903

FDIC Certificate Number: 27619
FDIC's unique number: 40453
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Charlotte

Federal Reserve ID Number: 864471
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 7E5

Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1903-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Piedmont Federal Savings And Loan Association.
2008-02-20 Moved bank headquarters from Winston-salem, North Carolina to Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2008-02-20 Changed name to Piedmont Federal Savings Bank .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $926,745,000
Total deposits: $710,543,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $710,543,000
Equity capital: $208,660,000

Net income: $1,948,000

Return on Assets: 0.42
Return on Equity: 1.88
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Piedmont Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Piedmont Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Piedmont Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-115

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.